Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/02/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/02/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 03/02/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 03/05/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 03/05/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/22/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/29/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/04/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 05/08/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/17/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/21/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 05/06/2008