There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Traumatic Brain Injury Act of 2008

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Traumatic Brain Injury Act of 2008

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Reauthorization of the Traumatic Brain Injury Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Reauthorization of the Traumatic Brain Injury Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Reauthorization of the Traumatic Brain Injury Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for the expansion and improvement of traumatic brain injury programs.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
04/28/2008Became Public Law No: 110-206. (TXT | PDF)
04/28/2008Signed by President.
04/17/2008Presented to President.
04/08/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 1 (Roll no. 163).(text: CR H2041-2043)
12/11/2007Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/01/2007Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Kennedy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 110-140.
03/07/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber
04/28/2008Became Public Law No: 110-206. (TXT | PDF)
04/28/2008Signed by President.
04/17/2008SenatePresented to President.
04/14/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/10/2008SenateSenate agreed to House amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2952-2954; text as Senate agreed to House amendment: CR S2952-2953)
04/09/2008SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
04/08/2008-7:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/08/2008-7:17pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 392 - 1 (Roll no. 163). (text: CR H2041-2043)
04/08/2008-7:08pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2047-2048)
04/08/2008-4:21pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/08/2008-4:06pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 793.
04/08/2008-4:06pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2041-2045)
04/08/2008-4:06pmHouseMs. Baldwin moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/12/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
12/12/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
12/12/2007SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/12/2007-10:15amHouseReceived in the House.
12/11/2007SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/11/2007SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
12/11/2007SenateS.Amdt.3831 Amendment SA 3831 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
12/11/2007SenateS.Amdt.3831 Amendment SA 3831 proposed by Senator Reid for Senator Kennedy. (consideration: CR S15154) In the nature of a substitute.
12/11/2007SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S15152-15154; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S15152-15153)
08/01/2007SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 317.
08/01/2007SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Reported by Senator Kennedy with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 110-140.
06/27/2007SenateCommittee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
03/07/2007SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2802-2803)
03/07/2007SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2801-2802)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions03/07/2007 Referred to
06/27/2007 Markup by
08/01/2007 Reported by S. Rept. 110-140
House Energy and Commerce12/12/2007 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health12/12/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.793. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-206 (04/28/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on April 8, 2008. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Traumatic Brain Injury Act of 2008 - (Sec. 3) Amends the Public Health Service Act to revise the national program for traumatic brain injury registries to make grants for state traumatic brain injury surveillance systems or registries (currently, only for registries) to: (1) determine the incidence and prevalence of traumatic brain injury and related disability; (2) ensure the uniformity of reporting under each such system or registry; (3) link individuals with traumatic brain injury to services and supports; and (4) link such individuals with academic institutions to conduct applied research.

Requires the Secretary of Health and Human Services, acting through the Director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC) and the Director of the National Institutes of Health (NIH), to report to the relevant congressional committees on activities and procedures that can be implemented by the CDC to improve the collection and dissemination of compatible epidemiological studies on the incidence and prevalence of traumatic brain injury in individuals who were formerly in the military.

(Sec. 4) Authorizes the Secretary, acting through the Director of CDC, to conduct a study to: (1) determine the incidence of traumatic brain injury and prevalence of traumatic brain injury related disability; (2) report national trends in traumatic brain injury; (3) identify common therapeutic interventions which are used for the rehabilitation of individuals with such injuries; (4) identify interventions and therapies that can prevent or remediate the development of secondary neurologic conditions related to traumatic brain injury; and (5) develop practice guidelines for such rehabilitation.

(Sec. 5) Authorizes appropriations for FY2009-FY2012 for NIH's trauma research program.

(Sec. 6) Allows the Secretary, acting through the Administrator of the Health Resources Services Administration (HRSA), to make grants to states and American Indian consortia (currently, only to states) to improve access to rehabilitation and other services (currently, to health and other services) regarding traumatic brain injury. Authorizes appropriations for such grants for FY2009-FY2012.

Requires the Administrator and the Commissioner of the Administration on Developmental Disabilities to coordinate the collection of data regarding protection and advocacy services. Directs the Administrator to make a grant for training and technical assistance to protection and advocacy systems, if funds permit. Authorizes appropriations for FY2009-FY2012.