Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/07/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/09/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/09/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/15/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/20/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/29/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/12/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/25/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/25/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/25/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/25/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 06/25/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/25/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/25/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/26/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 06/26/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/26/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/27/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 06/27/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 12/07/2007