Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/07/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 03/07/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/07/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/07/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/08/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/11/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/18/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/19/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/30/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 05/01/2008