Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/07/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 03/07/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/07/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 03/07/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 03/13/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/14/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/26/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 04/16/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/20/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/18/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/09/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 07/09/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 07/17/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/17/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/24/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/25/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 08/03/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/06/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/10/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/11/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/17/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/19/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/01/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/22/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/22/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/31/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/13/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 11/16/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 12/03/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/08/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/05/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/01/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/04/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/19/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/24/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 07/11/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 07/17/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/24/2008