Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 03/08/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/08/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/08/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/08/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 03/15/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 03/21/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/18/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/23/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 12/17/2007