Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/08/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/08/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 07/31/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 07/31/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/08/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/08/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 09/08/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/08/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/08/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/08/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/08/2008
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/10/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/10/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/11/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/11/2008
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 09/16/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 09/16/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/17/2008
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/17/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/17/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/18/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/18/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 09/18/2008
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/23/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 09/25/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 09/26/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/26/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/26/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/26/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/26/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 09/29/2008
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/29/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/30/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/30/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/30/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/01/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 10/01/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 10/01/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 10/01/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/17/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 11/17/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 11/17/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 11/17/2008