Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/09/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/09/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 03/09/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/16/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/12/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/12/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 07/12/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/05/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/05/2008