Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/12/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/12/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/02/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/10/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/07/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/21/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/22/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/24/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 12/04/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 12/10/2007