Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/12/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/12/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/12/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/12/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/12/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 03/14/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/15/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/19/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/29/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/11/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/10/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/17/2007