Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/15/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/15/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/15/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/27/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/10/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/30/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/16/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/21/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/20/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 06/25/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/09/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 07/11/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 09/04/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/11/2007