Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/04/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/08/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 01/09/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 01/09/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/09/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 01/24/2007
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 01/29/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 02/07/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/15/2007