Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 03/13/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 04/18/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/20/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/30/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/24/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/05/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/05/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/05/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/05/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/18/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 06/26/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/10/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/06/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/19/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/08/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/12/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/15/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/15/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/18/2008