Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/26/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/09/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/24/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/06/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 06/12/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew