Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/10/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 10/15/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/15/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/18/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 12/05/2007