Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 03/21/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/01/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 09/04/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 10/17/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/29/2008