Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/20/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 06/13/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/27/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 10/04/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/15/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 10/15/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 10/31/2007