Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 03/15/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 03/15/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 03/15/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/15/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/19/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 03/23/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/21/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 12/08/2008