Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 03/15/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/15/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/15/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/15/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/21/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/21/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/23/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/26/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/01/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/18/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/26/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/12/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/19/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/19/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/19/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 08/02/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/17/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/22/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/22/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 04/22/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/22/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 04/22/2008
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 04/22/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/22/2008
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/22/2008
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 04/22/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/22/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 04/22/2008
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/22/2008
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/22/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/22/2008
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/22/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 04/22/2008
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/22/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/22/2008
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/06/2008
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/06/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/06/2008
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/06/2008
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/06/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 05/06/2008
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/06/2008
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/06/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 05/06/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/06/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/06/2008
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 05/06/2008
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/06/2008
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/06/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/06/2008
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/06/2008
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/06/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/06/2008
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/06/2008
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/06/2008
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/06/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/14/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/14/2008
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 05/14/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 05/14/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 05/14/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/14/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/14/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/14/2008
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/14/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/14/2008
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/14/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/14/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/14/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/14/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/10/2008