Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/20/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 05/14/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/05/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/05/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 06/19/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/18/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/27/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 04/02/2008