Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 03/21/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 03/21/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/21/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/10/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/02/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/11/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/21/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/19/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 08/02/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/19/2008