Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 03/26/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/26/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 03/28/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/22/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/04/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/27/2007