Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/23/2007
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/23/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/12/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/12/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/12/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/16/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/16/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 04/17/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/17/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/17/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/17/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/17/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/19/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/19/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/25/2007
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/25/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/25/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 04/26/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/26/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 04/26/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/26/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/02/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 05/02/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/02/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/02/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 05/02/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/02/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/03/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/03/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/07/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/09/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/09/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 05/21/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/21/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 05/24/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 06/06/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/19/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/25/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/26/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/10/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/10/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/11/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/24/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/31/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 07/31/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/04/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/12/2007
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/24/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 10/16/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/16/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 10/23/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 12/04/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 12/04/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 12/11/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 12/11/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 03/13/2008
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/10/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/17/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 09/24/2008