Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/23/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/28/2007
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 04/10/2007
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA] 04/10/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/11/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/11/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/11/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 04/11/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/12/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 04/17/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 04/17/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/17/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/18/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/18/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 04/18/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/20/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL] 04/24/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/24/2007
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 04/24/2007
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY] 04/25/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 04/25/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/26/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/26/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/01/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/07/2007
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV] 05/07/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/07/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/08/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/10/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/10/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/15/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 05/15/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/22/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 05/22/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/22/2007
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/23/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 05/23/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/24/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/24/2007
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/24/2007
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/04/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 06/04/2007
Sen. Corker, Bob [R-TN] 06/04/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/06/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/11/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 06/13/2007
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 06/18/2007
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/20/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 06/26/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/26/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/27/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 06/27/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/28/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 07/11/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 07/12/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 08/02/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/03/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 09/06/2007
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 01/22/2008
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 01/22/2008
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 04/15/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 06/03/2008