Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/23/2007
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE] 03/23/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/07/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 05/14/2007
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN] 05/16/2007