Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bayh, Evan [D-IN]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/22/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 04/11/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/11/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/11/2007
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 04/12/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/30/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/10/2007
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 05/10/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 05/06/2008