Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/23/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/26/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 05/15/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/02/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 01/22/2008