Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/26/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/26/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 03/26/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 03/26/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/26/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 03/26/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 03/26/2007
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 03/26/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/26/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 03/26/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/26/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/26/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 03/26/2007
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/27/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 04/10/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/15/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN] 07/18/2007
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/26/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 08/02/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 08/02/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 08/02/2007
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 09/05/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 09/07/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/10/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/10/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/18/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/18/2007
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 09/19/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 10/03/2007
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 10/03/2007
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/15/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/15/2007
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/16/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/17/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/15/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 12/12/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 12/14/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 01/22/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 01/22/2008
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/26/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/04/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/11/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 03/11/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 03/12/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 04/21/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/25/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 09/08/2008
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 09/15/2008
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/26/2008
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 11/17/2008