There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Senator Paul Simon Study Abroad Foundation Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish the Senator Paul Simon Study Abroad Foundation under the authorities of the Mutual Educational and Cultural Exchange Act of 1961.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/27/2007Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/27/2007Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3838-3840)
Action By: Senate
03/27/2007Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3837-3838)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (49)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/28/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/28/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/28/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/10/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/10/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/11/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/12/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/12/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/12/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/17/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/17/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 04/20/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/20/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/23/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/15/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/11/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/12/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/18/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/19/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/20/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/26/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/31/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/02/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/25/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/08/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/09/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations03/27/2007 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.991. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (03/27/2007)

Senator Paul Simon Study Abroad Foundation Act of 2007 - Establishes in the executive branch the Senator Paul Simon Study Abroad Foundation to carry out this Act under the authorities of the Mutual Educational and Cultural Exchange Act of 1961.

Requires the Foundation to award grants, increasingly for study in nontraditional study abroad destinations, to: (1) U.S. students; (2) nongovernmental institutions that provide and promote study abroad opportunities for U.S. students, in consortium with institutions of higher education (IHEs); and (3) IHEs, individually or in consortium.