Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/28/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/28/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/28/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/10/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 04/10/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/11/2007
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/12/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/12/2007
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/12/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/17/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/17/2007
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL] 04/20/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/20/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 04/23/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 05/15/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 06/11/2007
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 06/12/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 06/18/2007
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/19/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/20/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 07/26/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 03/31/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/02/2008
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 06/25/2008
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 07/08/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 07/09/2008