Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO]* 03/27/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 04/30/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/30/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 05/08/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 05/11/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/23/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/06/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 06/14/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/19/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 01/31/2008
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/31/2008
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 01/31/2008
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 04/29/2008