Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 01/17/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 01/18/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/18/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 01/18/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 01/18/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 01/18/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 01/22/2007
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/22/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 01/22/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 01/22/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 01/22/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 01/24/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 01/24/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 01/25/2007
Sen. McCaskill, Claire [D-MO] 01/25/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 01/30/2007