Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 04/12/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/23/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/23/2007
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/24/2007
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/24/2007
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/02/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 05/09/2007
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/21/2007
Sen. Lincoln, Blanche L. [D-AR] 06/12/2007