Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (08/04/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Provides for: (1) a recess or an adjournment of the Senate from any day between August 3, 2007-August 31, 2007, until September 4, 2007 (or until another time of reassembly under this concurrent resolution); and (2) an adjournment of the House of Representatives from any legislative day between August 3, 2007-August 8, 2007, until September 4, 2007 (or until another time of reassembly).

Authorizes the Majority Leader of the Senate and the Speaker of the House, acting jointly after consultation with the Senate and House Minority Leaders, to notify the Members to reassemble whenever the public interest shall warrant it.