Text: S.Con.Res.61 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Enrolled Bill

 
[Congressional Bills 110th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[S. Con. Res. 61 Enrolled Bill (ENR)]

        S.Con.Res.61
                                     Agreed to December 19, 2007        

                       One Hundred Tenth Congress

                                 of the

                        United States of America


                          AT THE FIRST SESSION

          Begun and held at the City of Washington on Thursday,
            the fourth day of January, two thousand and seven


                          Concurrent Resolution

    Resolved by the Senate (the House of Representatives concurring), 
That when the Senate recesses or adjourns on any day from Tuesday, 
December 18, 2007, through Monday, December 31, 2007, on a motion 
offered pursuant to this concurrent resolution by its Majority Leader 
or his designee, it stand adjourned sine die, or until such day and 
time as may be specified in the motion to recess or adjourn, or until 
the time of any reassembly pursuant to section 3 of this concurrent 
resolution, whichever occurs first; and that when the House adjourns on 
any legislative day from Tuesday, December 18, 2007, through Saturday, 
December 22, 2007, on a motion offered pursuant to this concurrent 
resolution by its Majority Leader or his designee, it stand adjourned 
sine die, or until the time of any reassembly pursuant to section 3 of 
this concurrent resolution.
    Sec. 2. When the Senate recesses or adjourns on Thursday, January 
3, 2008, on a motion offered pursuant to this concurrent resolution by 
its Majority Leader or his designee, it shall stand recessed or 
adjourned until noon on Tuesday, January 22, 2008, or such other time 
on that day as may be specified in the motion to recess or adjourn, or 
until the time of any reassembly pursuant to section 3 of this 
concurrent resolution, whichever occurs first; and when the House 
adjourns on the legislative day of Thursday, January 3, 2008, on a 
motion offered pursuant to this concurrent resolution by its Majority 
Leader or his designee, it shall stand recessed or adjourned until noon 
on Tuesday, January 15, 2008, or until the time of any reassembly 
pursuant to section 3 of this concurrent resolution, whichever occurs 
first.
    Sec. 3. The Majority Leader of the Senate and the Speaker of the 
House, or their respective designees, acting jointly after consultation 
with the Minority Leader of the Senate and the Minority Leader of the 
House, shall notify Members of the Senate and the House, respectively, 
to reassemble at such a place and time as they may designate if, in 
their opinion, the public interest shall warrant it.
  Attest:

                                               Secretary of the Senate.

  Attest:

                                 Clerk of the House of Representatives.

Share This Section