Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (12/19/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Provides for an adjournment sine die of: (1) the Senate on any day from December 18-December 31, 2007 (or until another time of reassembly under this concurrent resolution); and (2) the House of Representatives on any legislative day from December 18-December 22, 2007 (or until another time of reassembly).

Provides that when: (1) the Senate recesses or adjourns on January 3, 2008, it stand recessed or adjourned until January 22, 2008 (or until another time of reassembly under this concurrent resolution, whichever occurs first); and (2) the House adjourns on the legislative day of January 3, 2008, it stand recessed or adjourned until January 15, 2008 (or until another time of reassembly, whichever occurs first).

Authorizes the Majority Leader of the Senate and the Speaker of the House, or their respective designees, acting jointly after consultation with the Minority Leaders of the Senate and of the House, to notify the Members of the Senate and the House, respectively, to reassemble at such place and time as they may designate whenever, in their opinion, the public interest shall warrant it.

.