Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 05/12/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 05/12/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 05/12/2008
Sen. Nelson, Ben [D-NE]* 05/12/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 05/12/2008
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA]* 05/12/2008
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/20/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 06/04/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/11/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/11/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/12/2008
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 06/12/2008
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/22/2008