There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A concurrent resolution supporting the goals and ideals of "National Sudden Cardiac Arrest Awareness Month".


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/22/2008Passed/agreed to in Senate: Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S9182)
09/22/2008Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9179-9185)
07/15/2008Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date Chamber
09/23/2008-11:02amHouseHeld at the desk.
09/23/2008-10:13amHouseReceived in the House.
09/23/2008SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/22/2008SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S9182)
09/22/2008SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9179-9185)
07/15/2008SenateReferred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6729-6730)

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 07/15/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 07/24/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/25/2008
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/11/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/11/2008

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/15/2008 Referred to
09/22/2008 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.Con.Res.93. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate without amendment (09/22/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Sudden Cardiac Arrest Awareness Month.