Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/04/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/10/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/10/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 09/11/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/11/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/17/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/17/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 09/20/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/28/2007
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/01/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH] 10/01/2007