Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/03/2008
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/03/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 06/03/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 06/03/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/03/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/06/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 06/06/2008
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/10/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 06/11/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 06/11/2008
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 06/17/2008
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/15/2008