Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 03/01/2007
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 03/05/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/12/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT] 04/10/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 05/09/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 06/25/2007
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/09/2007
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 10/04/2007