Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 06/12/2008
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Bunning, Jim [R-KY]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Martinez, Mel [R-FL]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 06/12/2008
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/18/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 06/18/2008
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/18/2008
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/18/2008
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH] 06/18/2008
Sen. Coburn, Tom [R-OK] 06/19/2008
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/19/2008
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 06/19/2008
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 06/23/2008
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 07/15/2008
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/15/2008
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 07/15/2008