Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Vitter, David [R-LA]* 06/25/2008
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 06/25/2008
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 06/25/2008
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 06/25/2008
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 06/25/2008
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 06/25/2008
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 06/25/2008
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 06/25/2008
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 06/26/2008
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 07/07/2008
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/07/2008
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 07/08/2008
Sen. DeMint, Jim [R-SC] 07/09/2008
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 07/09/2008
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 07/10/2008
Sen. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA] 07/11/2008
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC] 07/22/2008