Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Obama, Barack [D-IL]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/05/2007
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 03/06/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 03/09/2007
Sen. Pryor, Mark L. [D-AR] 03/13/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 03/13/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/13/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/15/2007