Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/21/2007 Became Public Law No: 110-155.
12/21/2007 Signed by President.
12/11/2007 Presented to President.
12/05/2007 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H14211)
07/31/2007 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S10525)
07/31/2007 Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10525)
03/08/2007 Introduced in Senate