There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A joint resolution providing for the reappointment of Patricia Q. Stonesifer as a citizen regent of the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/21/2007 Became Public Law No: 110-155. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2007 Signed by President.
12/11/2007 Presented to President.
12/05/2007 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H14211)
07/31/2007 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S10525)
07/31/2007 Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10525)
03/08/2007 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
12/21/2007 Became Public Law No: 110-155. (TXT | PDF)
12/21/2007 Signed by President.
12/11/2007 Senate Presented to President.
12/05/2007-4:11pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/05/2007-4:11pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H14211)
12/05/2007-4:04pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S.J. Res. 8.
12/05/2007-4:04pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H14211-14212)
12/05/2007-4:04pm House Mr. Brady (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the resolution.
08/01/2007 House Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
08/01/2007 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
08/01/2007-10:03am House Received in the House.
07/31/2007 Senate Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S10525)
07/31/2007 Senate Senate Committee on Rules and Administration discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10525)
03/08/2007 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 03/08/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/08/2007

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Rules and Administration03/08/2007 Referred to
07/31/2007 Discharged from
House Administration08/01/2007 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (8)

  • District of Columbia
  • Federal officials
  • Museums
  • Smithsonian Institution
  • Trusts and trustees

Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.J.Res.8. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-155 (12/21/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Reappoints Patricia Q. Stonesifer as a citizen regent of the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian Institution.