Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ensign, John [R-NV]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Coleman, Norm [R-MN]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [ID-CT]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Dole, Elizabeth [R-NC]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 03/14/2007
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/19/2007
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/20/2007
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/21/2007
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/11/2007
Sen. Salazar, Ken [D-CO] 04/16/2007
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 04/18/2007
Sen. Clinton, Hillary Rodham [D-NY] 04/19/2007
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/07/2007
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/18/2007
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 10/04/2007
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 01/22/2008