Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/18/2007
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/18/2007
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/18/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/02/2007
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 08/03/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/04/2007
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/04/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/05/2007
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/12/2007
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/15/2007
Sen. Lambert, Blanche M. [D-AR] 12/03/2007
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 12/11/2007
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 01/24/2008