Text: S.Res.217 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Agreed to Senate (05/24/2007)


110th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. RES. 217


Designating the week beginning May 20, 2007, as “National Hurricane Preparedness Week”.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

May 24, 2007

Mr. Vitter (for himself, Mr. Shelby, Mr. Lott, Mr. Martinez, Mr. Nelson of Florida, Ms. Landrieu, and Mr. DeMint) submitted the following resolution; which was considered and agreed to


RESOLUTION

Designating the week beginning May 20, 2007, as “National Hurricane Preparedness Week”.

    Whereas the President has proclaimed that the week beginning May 20, 2007, shall be known as “National Hurricane Preparedness Week”, and has called on government agencies, private organizations, schools, and media to share information about hurricane preparedness;

    Whereas, as hurricane season approaches, National Hurricane Preparedness Week provides an opportunity to raise awareness of steps that can be taken to help protect citizens, their communities, and property;

    Whereas the official Atlantic hurricane season occurs in the period beginning June 1, 2007, and ending November 30, 2007;

    Whereas hurricanes are among the most powerful forces of nature, causing destructive winds, tornadoes, floods, and storm surges that can result in numerous fatalities and cost billions of dollars in damage;

    Whereas, in 2005, a record-setting Atlantic hurricane season caused 28 storms, including 15 hurricanes, of which 7 were major hurricanes, including Hurricanes Katrina, Rita, and Wilma;

    Whereas the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration reports that over 50 percent of the population of the United States lives in coastal counties that are vulnerable to the dangers of hurricanes;

    Whereas, because the impact from hurricanes extends well beyond coastal areas, it is vital for individuals in hurricane prone areas to prepare in advance of the hurricane season;

    Whereas cooperation between individuals and Federal, State, and local officials can help increase preparedness, save lives, reduce the impact of each hurricane, and provide a more effective response to those storms;

    Whereas the National Hurricane Center within the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration of the Department of Commerce recommends that each at-risk family of the United States develop a family disaster plan, create a disaster supply kit, secure their home, and stay aware of current weather situations to improve preparedness and help save lives; and

    Whereas the designation of the week beginning May 20, 2007, as “National Hurricane Preparedness Week” will help raise the awareness of the individuals of the United States to assist them in preparing for the upcoming hurricane season: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved, That the Senate—

(1) supports the goals of the President in proclaiming the week beginning May 20, 2007, as “National Hurricane Preparedness Week”;

(2) encourages the people of the United States—

(A) to be prepared for the upcoming hurricane season; and

(B) to promote awareness of the dangers of hurricanes to help save lives and protect communities; and

(3) recognizes—

(A) the threats posed by hurricanes; and

(B) the need for the individuals of the United States to learn more about preparedness so that they may minimize the impacts of, and provide a more effective response to, hurricanes.