Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Sununu, John E. [R-NH]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Voinovich, George V. [R-OH]* 06/07/2007
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/11/2007
Sen. Webb, Jim [D-VA] 06/12/2007
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/19/2007
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/20/2007
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/20/2007
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 06/26/2007
Sen. Nelson, Bill [D-FL] 07/12/2007
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/17/2007